BATH, WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranging meetings for public worship, which includes Bible education and training in Christian living. Preaching the Christian message to the public within the congregation area. Distributing Bibles and other religious literature. All of these services and facilities are provided without charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 02 November 1997: Standard registration
- 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
- BATH OLDFIELD PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (Previous name)
- BATH OLDFIELD PARKCONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.80k | £10.95k | £6.15k | £4.67k | £5.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.19k | £4.38k | £8.78k | £3.67k | £4.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 April 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 08 July 2019 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE MODEL CONSTITUTION WAS APPROVED ON 17 OCTOBER 1996 AND ADOPTED WITHOUT ANY AMENDMENT BY THE CHARITY ON 29 MAY 1997. AMENDED 15 MARCH 2016.
Charitable objects
THE PRACTICE AND ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOUNDED ON THE HOLY BIBLE, AS UNDERSTOOD BY THE DENOMINATION OF CHRISTIANS KNOWN AS JEHOVAH;'S WITNESSES, INCLUDING THE PREACHING OF THE GOOD NEWS OF GOD'S KINGDOM BY JESUS CHRIST WITHIN THE CONGREGATION AREA AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS.
Area of benefit
BATH, OLDFIELD PARK, WESTON, TWERTON, WHITEWAY, SOUTHDOWN, ODD DOWN, TUNLEY, PRISTON, DUNKERTON, CORSTON, KELSTON, ENGLISHCOMBE, NEWTON ST LOE, WILMINGTON, STANTON PRIOR
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window