THE CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST TUNSTALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion by care for the church building, church yard and fixtures at Tunstall, or if it ceased to be a church, to care for it as a building of historic and architectural significance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 September 1999: Standard registration
- TUNSTALL ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS WILLIAM GILLIBRAND | Chair | 15 September 1999 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Heywood | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phil Stephenson | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Neil Crossley | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Clare | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Hannah Stephenson | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELIZABETH LITTLEY | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.69k | £6.23k | £5.55k | £7.13k | £4.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.41k | £6.40k | £4.31k | £2.23k | £1.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 2 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY RESTORATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, TUNSTALL INCLUDING THE MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS, CHATTELS, CHURCH BELLS AND CHURCHYARD 2. TO RESTORE, PRESERVE, REPAIR, MAINTAIN, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT THE ABOVE CHURCH AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC IMPORTANCE OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE IN THE EVENT OF THE CHURCH BEING MADE REDUNDANT OR OTHERWISE CEASING TO BE USED REGULARLY FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parkside
Woodman Lane
Cowan Bridge
Carnforth
LA6 2HU
- Phone:
- 01524271231
- Email:
- nwgillibrand@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window