Trustees UMBRELLA HOMES RESIDENTS TRUST
Charity number: 1071992

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN ALAN BOCQUET | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tracy Rowan | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lord Harry Hay | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Leigh | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM HARVEY | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE NORTHOVER | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JUDITH HERRING | Trustee | 14 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN CRAWFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.