SALAHUDDIN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Relief of Poverty Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of London
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 20 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMIN KHEDER | Trustee |
|
||||||
KAMAL A K HAMMAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMEER MAJEED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEJAT AMIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARHANK M KADER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.99k | £20.49k | £74.23k | £90.76k | £207.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.69k | £86.56k | £88.07k | £89.30k | £120.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.09k | N/A | N/A | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF ISLAM (2) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY AMONGST KURDISH PERSONS AND OTHER MUSLIMS (3) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE KURDISH AND/OR MUSLIM BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 NORFOLK PLACE
LONDON
W2 1QN
- Phone:
- 02074026874
- Email:
- salahudintrst@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
salahuddintrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window