SHOPMOBILITY BASINGSTOKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hire both powered and manual wheelchairs together with powered scooters to all residents and visitors to Basingstoke town centre to improve access to tht town centre and local facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TOM GILVEAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicholas John Bates | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Mary KELLY | Trustee | 03 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elsbeth Walton | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Hall | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|||||
CRISS CONNOR | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.59k | £100.24k | £68.65k | £75.93k | £108.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.50k | £82.24k | £62.07k | £77.19k | £97.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.95k | £65.53k | £23.48k | £22.95k | £22.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 22 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS LACKING MOBILITY WHETHER PERMANENT OR TEMPORARY BY IMPROVING THEIR MOBILITY BY THE PROVISION OF WHEELCHAIRS AND OTHER EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHOPMOBILITY
CHURCH STREET
BASINGSTOKE
RG21 7QQ
- Phone:
- 01256350142
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window