GREAT LEVER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hire a disused library for a rent of one peppercorn to run a community centre for all residence in Great Lever, Bolton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bolton
Governance
- 14 November 1997: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 April 2012: Re-registered
- GREAT LEVER COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JILLIAN MARY BRETHERTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.29k | £7.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.09k | £7.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1205 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1570 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION SOCIAL WELFARE AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION 2) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE 3) OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
GREAT LEVER AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window