Trustees CAMDEN ARTS CENTRE
Charity number: 1065829
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Halamish | Chair | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mackenzie | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Joshua Gaskin | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Allison Katz | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN SIMPSON | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tia Counts | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Earl Fobert | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|||||
MERISSA MARR | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Porus Jungalwalla | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sanig | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Anne Hardy | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.