THE GENDER IDENTITY RESEARCH EDUCATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GIRES provides information and education about trans and gender diverse issues to all those who can improve the circumstances in which trans and gender diverse people live, including politicians, policy makers, employers, organisations that deliver public and private services, family members and journalists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £14,230 from 6 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 February 1998: Standard registration
- GIRES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Octavian Starr | Chair | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arhin-Acquaah | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Faye Elisabeth Booth | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shaan Knan | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Suzanne Burton | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Helen Deans | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD W D REED OBE, MBA | Trustee | 29 October 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.83k | £30.09k | £77.55k | £93.51k | £141.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.84k | £60.57k | £59.48k | £133.41k | £139.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £450 | £450 | £3.85k | £6.15k | £14.23k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCTOBER 1997, AMENDED 29 JANUARY 1998, 15 JULY 2001 AND 11 OCTOBER 2009. as amended on 03 Sep 2019 as amended on 27 Oct 2019 as amended on 23 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
The Charity’s objects are to advance education regarding all forms of gender identity and intersex issues, and in particular: i. To initiate, promote and support research particularly to address the needs of those whose gender identity does not correspond with assumptions made at birth; ii. To publish the outcome of such research and other relevant information in order to inform interested parties and the general public; and iii. To achieve a wider understanding of these issues and thereby enable equal participation within society of those who experience them.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashcombe House
5 The Crescent
LEATHERHEAD
Surrey
KT22 8DY
- Phone:
- 01372 359481
- Email:
- info@gires.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window