Accounts and annual returns LITTLE SHEPHERDS DAY NURSERY

Charity Number: 1065868
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 25 June 2010 145 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 19 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 23 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 10 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 11 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On Time