LONDON, RICHMOND PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranging meetings for public worship, which includes Bible education and training in Christian living. Preaching the Christian message to the public within the congregation area. Distributing Bibles and other religious literature; also giving pastoral assistance to the congregation and the wider community, All of these services and facilities are provided without charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 10 November 1997: Standard registration
- 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
- KINGSTON UPON THAMES CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (Working name)
- LONDON, KINGSTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/10/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.26k | £16.07k | £17.33k | £16.67k | £3.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.56k | £15.35k | £18.08k | £13.18k | £1.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED 8 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PRACTICE AND ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOUNDED ON THE HOLY BIBLE, AS UNDERSTOOD BY THE DENOMINATION OF CHRISTIANS KNOWN AS JEHOVAH;'S WITNESSES, INCLUDING THE PREACHING OF THE GOOD NEWS OF GOD'S KINGDOM BY JESUS CHRIST WITHIN THE CONGREGATION AREA AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON-UPON-THAMES, SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window