THE BARNOLDSWICK OLD AGE PENSIONERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club is open to the general public not just the elderly - bingo, outings/trips, advice, concerts, police & fire surgeries, toe nail cutting service, craft class, room hire, meetings. A general warm welcome for coffee/tea, chat, company & companionship. All work is voluntary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £8,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 February 1998: Standard registration
- B.O.A.P.A. (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Barker | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Hodkinson | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.86k | £2.50k | £13.60k | £25.28k | £40.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £10.80k | £9.00k | £32.68k | £23.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.00k | £14.97k | £8.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DECEMBER 1996, AS AMENDED ON 2ND DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREINAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE TOWN OF BARNOLDSWICK AND SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT").
Area of benefit
BARNOLDSWICK AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Wellhouse Street
BARNOLDSWICK
Lancashire
BB18 6AR
- Phone:
- 07766562655
- Email:
- albarker39@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window