PROPERTY AT 4 POPLAR GARDENS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH NEW MALDEN BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Accomodation for church minister
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 November 1997: Standard registration
- 19 May 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- POPLAR TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £3.25k | £840 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.59k | £8.29k | £3.25k | £840 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 30 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 29 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 10 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 11 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED ON 8 OF JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL IF THE CHURCH IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IF AND WHEN NECESSARY FUNDS ARE PLACED AT THEIR DISPOSAL PERMIT TO BE ERECTED BY OR ACCORDING TO THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE CHURCH UPON THE PROPERTY OR ANY PART OF IT ANY EXTENSION ALTERATION REBUILDING OR OTHER WORKS WHICH THE CHURCH THINK PROPER FOR OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE ABOVE PURPOSES OR ANY OF THEM WITH POWER FOR THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO PULL DOWN ALTER ENLARGE REBUILD ADD TO EQUIP AND FURNISH ANY OF THE BUILDINGS FOR THE TIME BEING STANDING ON THE PROPERTY AND TO PERMIT SUCH BUILDINGS TO BE USED OCCUPIED OR ENJOYED AS THE CHURCH THINK PROPER FOR SUCH PURPOSES ACCORDINGLY.
Area of benefit
SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window