Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF GREAT DUNMOW MALTINGS

Charity number: 1069435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required