Trustees THE FRIENDS OF GREAT DUNMOW MALTINGS
Charity number: 1069435

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arran Thomason | Trustee | 28 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sudha Gray | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Emma Woods | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Norma Marshall | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
duncan stewart Sargeant | Trustee | 14 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Keith Behagg | Trustee | 15 November 2011 |
|
|||||
Ian Derek Morley Keast | Trustee | 16 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
Neil Tuttlebury | Trustee | 15 November 2008 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN KING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.