Financial history NORFOLK EARLY YEARS SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1066397
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £170.00k £165.10k £216.03k £65.57k £27.38k
Total expenditure £148.73k £144.33k £152.73k £127.73k £114.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A