RADNAGE C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING FUNDS FOR THE RADNAGE C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL TO SUPPLEMENT FUNDS FROM OFFICIAL SOURCES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 18 November 1997: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 November 2009: Standard registration
- RADNAGE C OF E INFANT SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- RADNAGE C OF E FIRST SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- RADNAGE C OF E INFANT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Oliver Bushrod | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Brown | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Maddix | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Frances Rockell | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Leslie Trueman | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laura Louise Morris | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.90k | £15.58k | £5.39k | £23.59k | £21.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.45k | £21.57k | £5.81k | £9.69k | £8.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2023 | 313 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 January 2021 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 January 2021 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH SEPTEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Radnage C Of E Primary School
City Road
Radnage
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP14 4DW
- Phone:
- 01494482167
- Email:
- office@radnage.bucks.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window