C.A.N.E.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
C.A.N.E. run a community centre offering a wide range of activities for people to attend. It runs a coffee shop and organises events such as quizes, table top sales and an annual summer fete for people to enjoy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Greenwich
Governance
- 10 December 1997: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF NEW ELTHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Martin Tester | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Read | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KILLICK | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Harris | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARY READ | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.74k | £50.08k | £52.32k | £36.00k | £39.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.58k | £44.10k | £33.64k | £41.00k | £44.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.38k | £27.63k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2025 | 312 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2025 | 312 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 March 2021 | 268 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED ON 27TH NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEW ELTHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO COOPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NEW ELTHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEW ELTHAM LIBRARY BUILDING
SOUTHWOOD ROAD
NEW ELTHAM
LONDON
SE9 3QT
- Phone:
- 02088507122
- Email:
- MANAGER.CANE@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window