RODLEY NATURE RESERVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nature reserve providing free access to the general public. A free educational resource for primary school groups and older students. Free guided walks for groups throughout the year. Special facilities for disabled visitors. Protection of the environment and biodiversity of the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
164 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 28 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Margaret Gander | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Finn | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Louise Staniland | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denese Lynn Swann | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Woodall Mr | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Ann McLeod | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER MURPHY | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Bellwood | Trustee | 23 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR JEREMY STEPHEN KNAPP | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARTHUR NESHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.96k | £75.78k | £60.07k | £54.41k | £78.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.87k | £49.16k | £55.50k | £44.71k | £70.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £9.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
THE CARE AND MANAGEMENT OF LEASED LANDS AT THE FORMER RODLEY SEWAGE TREATMENT WORKS AS A NATURE RESERVE BY HABITAT MANAGEMENT FOR WILDLIFE AND IN PARTICULAR THE WILDLIFE OF WETLAND HABITATS AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNDERSTANDING, APPRECIATION AND ENJOYMENT OF WILDLIFE BY ANY MEANS CONSISTENT WITH SUCH OBJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 WEST END LANE
HORSFORTH
LEEDS
LS18 5JP
- Phone:
- 01132930188
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window