Trustees LITTLE SOMERFORD PARISH HALL
Charity Number: 1068998

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Ireland | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Daynes | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Simmons | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Francis | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Tilley | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS L GLYNNE JONES | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Nuttall | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS D BEVERLEY | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS R NUTTALL | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR MIKE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.