FRIENDS OF KELLING HOSPITAL (INCORPORATING THE FRIENDS OF KELLING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds by charitable events and also we receive donations from grateful patients & their families and from Legacies. The money raised is spent on amenity services & equipment for the hospital and patients in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 25 February 1998: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF KELLING HOSPITAL (INCORPORATED 'THE FRIENDS OF KELLING') (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF KELLING HOSPITAL (INCORPORATING THE FRIENDS OF KELLING) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Sexton | Chair |
|
||||||
Lee Michael Rix | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Pedlow | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Gallacher | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Kopelman | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brocklesby | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN ROBERT BURROWS | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIA VIVIENNE WATERS | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.82k | £10.77k | £7.54k | £66.65k | £10.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.99k | £8.36k | £11.57k | £8.06k | £60.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 26TH JANUARY 1998 AND 3 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1. GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF KELLING HOSPITAL HIGH KELLING HOLT NORFOLK 2. TO RELIEVE FROM SUFFERING PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT DISABLED HANDICAPPED INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; 3. TO SUPPLEMENT THE SERVICE PROVIDED BY THE HOSPITAL FOR THE HEALTH WELFARE AND COMFORT OF THE PATIENTS THEREIN AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES BUILDINGS AND EQUIPMENT WHICH MAY BE REQUIRED FOR THE TREATMENT OF SUCH PATIENTS OR FOR THE EFFICIENT RUNNING OF THE HOSPITAL; 4. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES IN THE HOSPITAL FOR PATIENTS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION AND ESTABLISHMENT OF CLUBS HEALTH AND RECREATION CENTRES HOSTELS AND REST AND CONVALESCENT HOMES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE PATIENTS.
Area of benefit
KELLING
Contact information
- Address:
-
64A Pineheath Road
High Kelling
HOLT
Norfolk
NR25 6RH
- Phone:
- 01263 711232
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window