BRIGHTON, HOVE & DISTRICT EARLY CHILDHOOD PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Early Childhood Project believes that all children have the right to develop in a positive environment free from prejudice and discrimination. The project works positively to combat bias of every kind with others across Brighton & Hove and the surrounding area. The project provides information, resources and support to all those people involved in young childrens play, care and education, at w
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 26 February 1998: Standard registration
- EARLY CHILDHOOD PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA JANE LEWIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amina Omeri | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Ackley | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cara Redlich | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Simon | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Mx Charlie Paul Alexander Stray | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN RANDALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.65k | £47.77k | £40.67k | £38.61k | £29.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.31k | £33.41k | £42.49k | £41.75k | £35.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £12.99k | £11.61k | £9.89k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.16k | £12.49k | £14.89k | £5.00k | £14.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 6 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND SOCIAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF NINE YEARS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, NATIONALITY, ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGIN, RELIGION , GENDER, SEXUALITY , SOCIAL CLASS, DISABILITY OR AGE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO PARENTS , CARERS AND ALL WORKERS CONCERNED WITH THE EDUCATION AND SOCIAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tarner Family Hub
Ivory Place
Brighton
BN2 9QE
- Phone:
- 07946889890
- Email:
- info@ecpuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window