HANLEY CASTLE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has two single and one double dwellings for needy people exclusively with strong hanley castle connections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 December 1997: Standard registration
- 12 August 2024: Funds received from 1066769 HANLEY CASTLE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- HANLEY CASTLE PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Susan Margaret Eliza Adeney | Chair | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Margaret Peer | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Victoria Garner | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Owens | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.15k | £3.15k | £3.15k | £3.15k | £3.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £905 | £841 | £1.33k | £2.40k | £1.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2022 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME 10TH OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND CHARITY FOR THOSE FROM THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
HANLEY CASTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Innside,
Church End,
Hanley Castle,
Worcester
WR8 0BL
- Phone:
- 01684594021
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window