Financial history ST JOHN'S WELCOME CENTRE

Charity number: 1068100
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008
Total gross income £59.33k £55.36k £46.92k £25.32k £6.17k
Total expenditure £76.27k £74.45k £46.44k £24.52k £20.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A