Financial history THE MONDAY FUN CLUB

Charity number: 1066044
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £1.51k £1.18k £730 £1.16k £1.02k
Total expenditure £2.17k £1.45k £858 £1.66k £832
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A