BEDFORD, ITALIAN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranging meetings for pulic worship which includes bible education and training in christian living .Preaching the christian message to the public within the congregation area.Distributing bibles and other religious literature , also giving pastoral assistance to the congregation and a wider community. All of these facilities are provided without charge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 20 November 1997: Standard registration
- 28 May 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 28 May 2014: Funds transferred to 1066001 BEDFORD, FENLAKE CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESS...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.03k | £3.26k | £5.53k | £3.07k | £3.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.23k | £4.47k | £2.87k | £8.10k | £2.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 14 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 14 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 09 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE MODEL CONSTITUTION WAS APPROVED ON 17 OCTOBER 1996 AND ADOPTED WITHOUT ANY AMENDMENT BY THE CHARITY ON 30TH MAY, 1997.
Charitable objects
THE PRACTICE AND ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOUNDED ON THE HOLY BIBLE, AS UNDERSTOOD BY THE DENOMINATION OF CHRISTIANS KNOWN AS JEHOVAH;'S WITNESSES, INCLUDING THE PREACHING OF THE GOOD NEWS OF GOD'S KINGDOM BY JESUS CHRIST WITHIN THE CONGREGATION AREA AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS.
Area of benefit
ITALIAN SPEAKING HOUSEHOLDS IN BEDFORD, LUTON, CAMBRIDGE, HITCHING, LETCHWORTH, DUNSTABLE, AYLESBURY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window