TILBURY RIVERSIDE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Queen's Jubilee Award for Voluntary Service in 2007. Partnership-English Heritage for Heritage Open Days since 2008. Founder, Peter Hewitt, awarded the MBE in the Queen's Birthday honours in 2010. Working on delivering projects funded by the Heritage Lottery Fund during 2015-2018 including Tilbury memories, the Windrush event to 3000 people and a local christmas lights/ childrens performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Thurrock
Governance
- 19 March 1998: Standard registration
- TRP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leslie Morgan | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yolande Simmons | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Terry Charles Brown | Trustee | 11 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNIE O'BRIEN | Trustee | 13 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Spencer | Trustee | 16 May 2005 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ANTON OSTLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR DAN ALABEDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.50k | £28.01k | £33.17k | £34.18k | £37.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.47k | £32.49k | £29.71k | £37.38k | £33.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH FEBRUARY 1998 AS AMENDED 12TH MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF TILBURY, ITS RIVERSIDE AND COMMUNITY AMENITIES, PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE RIVERFRONT BETWEEN TILBURY FORT AND COALHOUSE FORT; TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE NATURAL AND PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT OF TILBURY; AND TO PRESERVE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BUILDINGS OF HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL SIGNIFICANCE IN TILBURY. THE TILBURY RIVESIDE PROJECT IS FURTHER ESTABLISHED TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF TILBURY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
TILBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVERSIDE ARTS & ACTIVITY CENTRE
FERRY ROAD
TILBURY
RM18 7NH
- Phone:
- 01375859911
- Email:
- info@tilburyriverside.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window