Accounts and annual returns ALLABOARD ST MARYS NURSERY

Charity number: 1067896
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 25 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 25 February 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 16 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 16 June 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 20 November 2009 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 30 September 2009 92 days late
Annual return 31 August 2007 28 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 28 June 2008 On Time