LULWORTH CAMP PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A PRE-SCHOOL FOR ALL LOCAL CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES TO ACCESS - SOMEWHERE CHILDREN CAN LEARN AND SOCIALISE IN A CARING ENVIRONMENT. FAMILIES ARE WELCOME AND CAN ACCESS INFORMATION ON EARLY YEARS EDUCATION, BECOME MEMBERS ON OUR MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE AND HELP TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 28 November 1997: Standard registration
- 09 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.68k | £22.92k | £18.93k | £8.53k | £12.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.95k | £18.92k | £18.78k | £16.40k | £15.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window