Trustees ACTIVATE PERFORMING ARTS
Charity number: 1069622

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL NOONAN | Chair | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rohan Gotobed | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROWAN HEDLEY | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARY OLIVER | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARA ST GEORGE | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN METCALFE | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Irwin | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Polly Ann Gifford | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.