NORTHCOTE HOMEOPATHY TRUST (N.H.T.)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Accommodation providing care, support and supervision for vulnerable people. Homoeopathic treatment is provided within the support criterion to address both physical and emotional issues. Accommodation is only provided for people needing care, support or supervision. Homoeopathic treatment is also available to the general public in receipt of benefits/low income.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 10 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liam Michael McClafferty | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR A CAPEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS M MCCLAFFERTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 July 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 NOVEMBER 1997 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26 APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HOMEOPATHIC TREATMENT, COUNSELLING, ACCOMMODATION AND RELATED SERVICES TO PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION TO PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 44 Gravelly Hill
Erdington
Birmingham
B23 7JY
- Phone:
- 01213085417
- Email:
- mary-mcclafferty@lineone.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window