THE FRIENDS OF ST. WULFRAM'S CHURCH, GRANTHAM

Charity Number: 1066896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main aim of the charity is the preservation and beautification of St. Wulframs Church, the Parish Church of Grantham in Lincolnshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £25,041
Total expenditure: £10,425

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stuart Cradduck Chair 18 October 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WULFRAM, GRANTHAM
Received: On time
CHARITY OF CHARLES CLARKE FOR CHURCH PURPOSES
Received: On time
LANGWITH CHARITY FOR POOR WOMEN
Received: On time
DONAL CONTRIBUTION FUND
Received: On time
THE PHILIP LANK TRUST
Received: On time
Janet Burrows Trustee 05 September 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Thurlow Hazelwood Trustee 05 September 2024
None on record
Judith Margery Davis Trustee 12 October 2019
None on record
Brian Harold Stagg Trustee 12 October 2019
None on record
Fiona Ruth Crook Trustee 17 January 2019
GRANTHAM CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Valerie Doska York Trustee 14 October 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WULFRAM, GRANTHAM
Received: On time
Dr JOHN BERNARD Manterfield Trustee 18 October 2014
GRANTHAM CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WULFRAM, GRANTHAM
Received: On time
Graham Peter Cook Trustee
GRANTHAM AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £7.24k £7.24k £13.25k £46.00k £25.04k
Total expenditure £4.13k £4.13k £2.37k £6.51k £10.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 22 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 22 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 02 August 2024 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 August 2024 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 BEACON LANE
GRANTHAM
NG31 9DL
Phone:
01476573613