OVERSEAS CHINESE ASSOCIATION (SOUTH WEST REGION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Current activities include: Chinese language school for children, Elderly People's Club, Womens' Group, social outings, annual dinner and festivity celebrations, translation services & courses for members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 20 March 1998: Standard registration
- OVERSEAS CHINESE ASSOCIATION (SOUTH WEST AREA) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tai Wah Yuen | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yuk Yiu WONG | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMELIA LEUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WAN LOY WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND WAN SUN WONG MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.36k | £41.76k | £111.07k | £45.97k | £49.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.28k | £42.29k | £43.44k | £67.90k | £66.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.55k | £5.83k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2024 | 290 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2024 | 290 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2024 | 634 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2024 | 634 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2023 | 381 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2023 | 381 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 AUGUST 1998, AS AMENDED 15 MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY. 2. TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. 3. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND SOUTH WEST AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15
LOWER ASHLEY ROAD
ST AGNES
BRISTOL
BS2 9QA
- Phone:
- 01179555225
- Email:
- info@ocasw.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window