ILKESTON EAST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1066377
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Arranging meetings for public religious worship, which includes Bible education & training in Christian living. Preaching & teaching the Christian message to the public, in the congregation area, to that end, distributing Bibles and other religious literature to the congregation & public, providing assistance & counselling to congregation & public. All these services & facilities without charge.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £11,347
Total expenditure: £11,748

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 1997: Standard registration
  • 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ILKESTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £31.92k £22.62k £9.16k £10.95k £11.35k
Total expenditure £38.77k £23.98k £8.95k £9.79k £11.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required