THE NEK CHAND FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides information on Nek Chand's Rock Garden, Chandigarh. Organizes volunteer groups to clean, repair and work on Rock Garden. Undertakes and supports research projects on Rock Garden.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hertfordshire
- India
Governance
- 26 May 1998: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Maizels | Chair | 05 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Alan Cesarano | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPE LESPINASSE | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
HARSH KUMAR LAKHANPAL | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIA ELMORE | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAIN JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/07/2019 | 25/07/2020 | 25/07/2021 | 25/07/2022 | 25/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £60 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 July 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 July 2022 | 03 September 2024 | 467 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 July 2021 | 03 September 2024 | 832 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 July 2020 | 01 August 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 July 2019 | 01 August 2021 | 433 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 31 JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF SCULPTURE IN PARTICULAR BY:- (1) DEVELOPING AND ASSISTING IN THE DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ROCK GARDEN DEVISED AND CREATED BY NEK CHAND IN CHANDIGARGH, INDIA AND IN SO DOING TO ENSURE THAT THE ROCK GARDEN REMAINS OPEN TO THE PUBLIC; (2) HOLDING CLASSES, TALKS, LECTURES AND WORKSHOPS IN EUROPE AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND ASSISTING STUDENTS FROM EUROPE AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO VISIT THE ROCK GARDEN, POSSIBLY BY WAY OF EXCHANGE WITH STUDENTS FROM THE CHANDIGARGH COLLEGE OF ARCHITECTURE AND THE UNIVERSITY OF THE PUNJAB AND FROM OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN INDIA.
Area of benefit
INDIA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR COTTAGE
THE GREEN
LETCHMORE HEATH
WATFORD
WD25 8EP
- Phone:
- 01923853175
- Email:
- nekchand@rawvision.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window