Financial history THE HARPUR TRUST

Charity number: 1066861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £53.87m £55.14m £60.69m £68.63m £75.47m
Total expenditure £55.15m £54.90m £60.07m £67.75m £73.99m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.17m £1.00m £19.00k £34.00k £22.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.21m £1.30m £242.00k £500.00k £360.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £195.00k
Income - Charitable activities £49.17m £51.26m £58.06m £63.87m £70.59m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.43m £2.53m £1.84m £3.78m £3.95m
Income - Other £62.00k £60.00k £548.00k £479.00k £368.00k
Income - Legacies £840.00k £0 £40.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £54.75m £54.65m £59.36m £67.02m £73.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £398.00k £242.00k £707.00k £733.00k £904.00k
Expenditure - Governance £447.00k £446.00k £567.00k £561.00k £651.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.06m £1.46m £1.21m £1.22m £1.23m
Expenditure - Investment management £353.00k £192.00k £674.00k £721.00k £647.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0