THE TENDRING VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a building for the local community and the activities of the surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 08 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Abbott | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAVID COSBY | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Parker | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cauvain | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Dodman | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN GOODMAN | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Edwards | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Barker | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katie Jane Carr | Trustee | 03 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA GOODMAN | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|||||
GLENN JOHN WILLIAM GOOCH | Trustee |
|
||||||
IAN PATCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.32k | £24.91k | £23.53k | £7.93k | £12.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.64k | £4.38k | £57.39k | £5.69k | £10.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | £17.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH APRIL 1999 as amended on 20 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL UNDER THE TITLE OF "THE TENDRING VILLAGE HALL" FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS AND NEIGHBOURHOOD OF THE PARISH OF TENDRING IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TENDRING
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAZYLANDS
CROW LANE
TENDRING
CLACTON-ON-SEA
CO16 9AW
- Phone:
- 01255830295
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window