CROYDON ANIMAL SAMARITANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The rescue, shelter and provision of veterinary care for unwanted or abandoned animals and, wherever possible to find them suitable homes. To help pet owners meet necessary veterinary expenses in certain circumstances should they be unable to do so and if funds allow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Croydon
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 16 January 1998: Standard registration
- C A S (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Christopher Hills BEM | Chair | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Parsons | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Gleaves | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Caterer-Stentiford | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ERNEST MOORE | Trustee | 06 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNA NIKOLIC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.89k | £174.49k | £392.82k | £245.43k | £211.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.70k | £194.13k | £228.97k | £175.20k | £223.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £14.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 December 2022 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 December 2022 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2022 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2022 | 246 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 January 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 January 2021 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 20TH FEBRUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
[1] WHEREVER POSSIBLE RESCUE AND PROVIDE CARE AND SHELTER FOR UNWANTED / ABANDONED, NEGLECTED / ILL-TREATED ANIMALS AND TO MAKE EVERY EFFORT TO SECURE SUITABLE NEW HOMES FOR THEM. [2] IN CASES OF URGENT NEED / EMERGENCY TO ASSIST OWNERS OF PETS TO MEET VETERINARY AND OTHER COSTS WHEN OWNERS ARE UNABLE TO DO SO AND WHEN FUNDS ALLOW.
Area of benefit
INNER AND OUTER LONDON, SURREY AND PARTS OF SUSSEX AND KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Croydon Animal Samaritans
136 Cherry Orchard Road
CROYDON
CR0 6BB
- Phone:
- 020 8698 6813
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window