Financial history COCKERMOUTH CHRISTIAN CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1067541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £101.81k £270.28k £171.02k £370.74k £268.67k
Total expenditure £92.95k £121.84k £162.68k £246.60k £308.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.64k £23.14k £105.70k £16.68k