Accounts and annual returns THE MUSIC FOR SCHOOLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1067859
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 September 2024 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 09 September 2024 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 18 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window