Financial history CYMDEITHAS RHIENI YSGOL GYMRAEG CASTELL-NEDD

Charity Number: 1068799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.25k £11.99k £1.71k £10.73k £13.21k
Total expenditure £6.61k £8.49k £362 £6.84k £6.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A