MISSIONARY VENTURES EUROPE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Missionary Ventures is an interdenominational Christian charity that serves and equips national churches to reach their nations with the love and message of Jesus Christ. We partner with British churches, individuals and organisations, motivating and facilitating their involvement in the mission field, mainly through sending short-term mission teams and raising funds for strategic projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Eswatini
- Greece
- India
- Kenya
- Latvia
- Macedonia
- Moldova
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Philippines
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Tonga
- Uganda
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 21 January 1998: Standard registration
- MVE (Working name)
- MVGB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN BOLTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Darren Michael Mitzi | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|||||
GARY HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV LUTHER LEE MEIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ORANGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.82k | £96.78k | £101.27k | £106.75k | £65.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.42k | £98.06k | £82.25k | £94.76k | £66.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, EUROPE AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD: 1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY. 3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION. 4) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM, EUROPE AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
MISSIONARY VENTURES GREAT BRITAIN
PO BOX 741
ROCHDALE
OL16 9QD
- Phone:
- 07453080119
- Email:
- info@mvgb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window