SALFORD CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE A SAFE, FRIENDLY AND NEUTRAL PLACE WHERE CHILDREN OF SEPARATED FAMILIES CAN SPEND TIME WITH ONE OR BOTH PARENTS, AND SOMETIMES OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS. iT IS A CHILD-CENTRES ENVIRONMENT THAT PUTS THE NEEDS OF THE CHILDREN FIRST. REFERRALS CAN BE MADE FROM ANYWHERE IN THE UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Salford City
Governance
- 14 January 1998: Standard registration
- 26 July 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 26 July 2012: Funds transferred to 1091496 PRO-CONTACT EXPERT SERVICES
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.80k | £4.39k | £4.77k | £5.25k | £9.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.21k | £3.58k | £7.14k | £4.29k | £5.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 12 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 02 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED ON 4 JULY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THE CHILDREN RESIDENT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT CAUSED BY THE BREAK UP OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL GOOD HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A CENTRE AND FACILITIES WHEREBY SUCH CHILDREN CAN MORE READILY ENJOY THE COMPANY AND LOVE OF THEIR NON-RESIDENTIAL PARENT AND/OR EXTENDED FAMILY MEMBERS
Area of benefit
SALFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window