Trustees EALING YOUTH ORCHESTRA
Charity number: 1067041

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Panagiota Stathaki | Chair | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Louise Johnson | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ken Ian Maclachlan | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Nicola Thompson | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aurelie Edus | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Augustine Francis Watts | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Maria Hyams | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Conor Curran | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Madhu Swapna Prasadam | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Dacre Harvey | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Jane Elizabeth Laddiman | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.