VISTA INDIA CHARITABLE TRUST (U.K.)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a small charity, we help the orphanages in providing food items, and educational aids to handicapped children in England and Wales. We also help to improve the living standards of poor rural women from the depressed classes in India to the extent possible by us thro our India contact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 09 July 1998: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- VISTA-INDIA CHARITABLE TRUST (UK) (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.68k | £3.65k | £3.63k | £4.13k | £4.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.62k | £3.63k | £3.62k | £4.12k | £4.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 15 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 12 February 2008 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 28 February 2007 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE GENERAL AND VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING, TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS, PRIMARILY WOMEN AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE LIVING IN THE KARNATAKA STATE IN INDIA (2) TO UNDERTAKE OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN ANT OTHER PART OF INDIA, AS WELL AS ENGLAND AND WALES, PARTICULARLY BENEFITING WOMEN AND CHILDREN, IN ACCORDANCE WITH AND WITHIN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND INDIA
Area of benefit
ENGLAND, WALES AND INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window