Tanfield Railway Trust Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preserving the railway heritage of North East England, particularly industrial and independent railways and local locomotive builders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
- Gateshead
Governance
- 13 November 1998: Standard registration
- TYNESIDE LOCOMOTIVE MUSEUM TRUST (Working name)
- THE TYNESIDE LOCOMOTIVE MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Hodgson | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Charles Lewis | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Duncan | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Redvers Vout | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WILLIAM SMITH | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GARDINER CHARLTON | Trustee | 18 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAN COWAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.54k | £58.29k | £47.59k | £113.03k | £75.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.77k | £65.19k | £91.04k | £60.76k | £15.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.78k | £40.42k | £25.19k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 MAY 1998. CERTIFICATE UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 NOVEMBER 1996 as amended on 04 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY ACQUIRING HOUSING AND EXHIBITING AND CONSERVING RESTORING AND REPAIRING OBJECTS AND COLLECTIONS OF AN EDUCATIONAL NATURE AND BY ESTABLISHING ACQUIRING MANAGING AND MAINTAINING MUSEUMS GALLERIES LIBRARIES AND OTHER PLACES WHERE SUCH PURPOSES MAY BE ACHIEVED AND WHERE EDUCATION AND EDUCATIONAL RESEARCH AND ENQUIRY AND THE EXCHANGE AND DISSEMINATION OF RELEVANT VIEWS AND INFORMATION MAY HAPPEN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tanfield Railway
Marley Hill Engine Shed
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE16 5ET
- Phone:
- 07880801261
- Email:
- trust@tanfield-railway.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window