Accounts and annual returns TOTS R US PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1067072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 06 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 06 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 24 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 04 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 07 June 2021 7 days late Download Open in new window