Trustees TOTS R US PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1067072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
megan hollis Chair 03 September 2015
None on record
sarah morahan Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
nicola hollis Trustee 09 June 2020
None on record
georgina brown Trustee 07 December 2018
None on record
steven Lyus Trustee 03 September 2015
None on record
SAMUEL HOLLIS Trustee 19 April 2013
None on record