THE FRIENDS OF THE COLLEGIATE CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, LINGFIELD

Charity number: 1066774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support the maintenance, repair and development of the church of St Peter and St Paul, Lingfield.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,450
Total expenditure: £93

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 1997: Standard registration
  • 13 January 2015: Funds received from 275534 THE COLLEGIATE CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, LIN...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER & ST PAUL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD YOUNG Chair 27 July 1997
None on record
Rev Ian Peter Whitley Trustee 16 March 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST DORMANSLAND, SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, LINGFIELD
Received: On time
LINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Robert William Mitchell Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Maurice Edward Cox Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record
VIVIEN MARY JONES Trustee 19 March 2018
NYSTAGMUS NETWORK
Received: On time
Sally Martin Trustee 29 January 2014
THE FRIENDS OF THE COLLEGE OF ST BARNABAS
Received: On time
LINGFIELD UNITED TRUST
Received: On time
LINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
COLLEGE OF ST BARNABAS
Received: 199 days late
JENNIFER HOLROYD Trustee 11 October 2011
None on record
JOANNA BROWN Trustee 06 October 1997
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, LINGFIELD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.45k £2.04k £3.79k £5.00k £2.45k
Total expenditure £2.32k £1.96k £15.45k £12.02k £93
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 February 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROSEBANK
TOWN HILL
LINGFIELD
RH7 6AE
Phone:
01342832293
Website:

No information available