Financial history MINIK KARDES LTD

Charity number: 1067893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.27m £1.57m £1.65m £1.65m £2.52m
Total expenditure £1.22m £1.22m £1.39m £1.56m £2.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £793.45k £1.27m £1.09m £1.06m £1.68m
Income - Donations and legacies £17.76k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £32.04k £9.13k £37.76k £35.41k
Income - Charitable activities £1.25m £271.00k £555.85k £559.88k £801.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.30k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.22m £1.39m £1.56m £2.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.90k £133.49k £129.67k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0