Trustees PETERSFIELD YOUTH THEATRE

Charity number: 1069673
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda HILL Chair
None on record
Diana Lorna McKechnie Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Helen Lois Dennis Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Stephen Liddle Trustee 23 January 2023
None on record
Michael Foreman Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Melanie Styles Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Gill Davies Trustee 15 October 2016
None on record
CHARLOTTE GODFREY Trustee 16 March 2015
None on record
NIK ASHTON Trustee 21 September 2012
None on record